THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:00:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 770-0087
Fax: (905) 770-0053

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mak (CPSO#: 63999 )
Business Address: 203 - 22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3Y1
(905) 770-0087

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 770-0087
Fax: (905) 770-0053

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mak (CPSO#: 63999 )
Business Address: 203 - 22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3Y1
(905) 770-0087

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTOR MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTOR MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991