THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:25:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Village Square Medical Centre
2942 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-2725
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dan Wan Hung Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yeung (CPSO#: 64013 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Village Square Medical Centre
2942 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-2725
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dan Wan Hung Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yeung (CPSO#: 64013 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAN WAN HUNG YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAN WAN HUNG YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991