THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 564 Belmont Ave.
Suite 409
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 584-0180
Fax: (519) 584-0182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Dec 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Maurice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maurice (CPSO#: 64020 )
Business Address: 409 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 584-0180
Business Address: 122 Allen St W
Waterloo ON N2L 1E9
519-502-9987

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 564 Belmont Ave.
Suite 409
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 584-0180
Fax: (519) 584-0182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Dec 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Maurice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maurice (CPSO#: 64020 )
Business Address: 409 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 584-0180
Business Address: 122 Allen St W
Waterloo ON N2L 1E9
519-502-9987

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JUDE MAURICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAURICE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JUDE MAURICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAURICE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991