THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:06:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 715 - 115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 742-0506
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 742-0506
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 03 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. W. King (CPSO#: 64039 )
Business Address: 715-115 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V

Corporation Name: Nelson King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 715 - 115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 742-0506
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 742-0506
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 03 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. W. King (CPSO#: 64039 )
Business Address: 715-115 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V

Corporation Name: Nelson King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM IAN NELSON KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM IAN NELSON KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991