THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:47:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Middlegate Rd
2nd floor
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 804 7000
Fax: (905) 804-2250
Address: Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Dr.
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Centre, Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 27 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manish Maingi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maingi (CPSO#: 64042 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Middlegate Rd
2nd floor
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 804 7000
Fax: (905) 804-2250
Address: Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Dr.
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Centre, Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 27 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manish Maingi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maingi (CPSO#: 64042 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANISH MAINGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAINGI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANISH MAINGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAINGI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991