THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:48:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Extension: 6743
Fax: (905) 472-7621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allan J. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yee (CPSO#: 64054 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(416) 295-6965

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Extension: 6743
Fax: (905) 472-7621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allan J. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yee (CPSO#: 64054 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(416) 295-6965

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN JOHN YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN JOHN YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991