THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:34:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Vascular Surgery
7- 074A Bond Wing
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-6047
Fax: 416-864-6012
Address: Suite 550
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 825-8272
Fax: (905) 827-2275

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 04 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Szalay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Szalay (CPSO#: 64055 )
Business Address: Suite 5N - 504
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44644
Business Address: Suite 550
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 7-074A
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
416-864-6047

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Vascular Surgery
7- 074A Bond Wing
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-6047
Fax: 416-864-6012
Address: Suite 550
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 825-8272
Fax: (905) 827-2275

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 04 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Szalay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Szalay (CPSO#: 64055 )
Business Address: Suite 5N - 504
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44644
Business Address: Suite 550
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 7-074A
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
416-864-6047

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY SZALAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZALAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY SZALAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZALAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991