THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:40:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 630 Peter Robertson Blvd
Suite 15
Brampton Ontario L6R 1T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 793-8868
Fax: (905) 793-8957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donovan Sequeira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sequeira (CPSO#: 64059 )
Business Address: 15 - 630 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 1T4
(905) 793-8868

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 630 Peter Robertson Blvd
Suite 15
Brampton Ontario L6R 1T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 793-8868
Fax: (905) 793-8957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donovan Sequeira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sequeira (CPSO#: 64059 )
Business Address: 15 - 630 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 1T4
(905) 793-8868

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONOVAN ST CLAIR SEQUEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEQUEIRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONOVAN ST CLAIR SEQUEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEQUEIRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Sep 2009
Summary of Decision:
On September 18, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sequeira committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Patient A had been Dr. Sequeira's patient since she was 16 years old. At the time of Patient A's final medical appointment with Dr. Sequeira, she was 21, and he was 39 years of age. At the conclusion of that medical appointment, Dr. Sequeira and Patient A discussed meeting socially. Prior to their first date, Dr. Sequeira informed Patient A that she could no longer be his patient. Within four days of his last medical appointment with her, they had dinner together and communicated with each other romantically. By the following month, they engaged in kissing and other physical contact, and by the fourth month following the final medical appointment, they had engaged in sexual intercourse.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Sequeira's certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, to commence within eight (8) weeks of the date of the Order.
2. Dr. Sequeira successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course and the College's Boundaries Course, on the next available date, and to provide proof thereof to the College.
3. Dr. Sequeira appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
4. Dr. Sequeira pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650, within 30 days of the date of the Order.
5. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 18, 2009

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Sep 2009
Summary of Decision:
On September 18, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sequeira committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Patient A had been Dr. Sequeira's patient since she was 16 years old. At the time of Patient A's final medical appointment with Dr. Sequeira, she was 21, and he was 39 years of age. At the conclusion of that medical appointment, Dr. Sequeira and Patient A discussed meeting socially. Prior to their first date, Dr. Sequeira informed Patient A that she could no longer be his patient. Within four days of his last medical appointment with her, they had dinner together and communicated with each other romantically. By the following month, they engaged in kissing and other physical contact, and by the fourth month following the final medical appointment, they had engaged in sexual intercourse.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Sequeira's certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, to commence within eight (8) weeks of the date of the Order.
2. Dr. Sequeira successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course and the College's Boundaries Course, on the next available date, and to provide proof thereof to the College.
3. Dr. Sequeira appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
4. Dr. Sequeira pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650, within 30 days of the date of the Order.
5. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 18, 2009

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 12 May 2010
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 12 May 2010

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991