THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:53:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Streetsville Medical Centre
5425 Creditview Road
Unit 8
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214
Address: 10260 Kennedy Rd North
Brampton Ontario L6T 3S1
Phone: (905) 495-4695
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2180 Speakman Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1
Phone: 9053692442
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4350 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7C8
Phone: (905) 812-1175
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1060 Eglinton Ave
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1K3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2180 Speakman Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1
Phone: 9053692442
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10443 Highway 27
Vaughan
Woodbridge Ontario L0J 1C0
Phone: (289) 202-2222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sequeira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sequeira (CPSO#: 64093 ) Dr. N. Sequeira (CPSO#: 122008 )
Business Address: 10260 Kennedy Road North
Brampton Ontario L6T 3S1
(905) 495-4695
Business Address: 1060 Eglinton Avenue Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1K3
(905) 624-1511
Business Address: Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164
Business Address: 7891 McLaughlin Road
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5H8
(905) 459-4904
Business Address: 4350 Mississauga Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7C8
(905) 812-1175
Business Address: 2250 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5B 1M8
9052700411
Business Address: 2180 Speakman Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Streetsville Medical Centre
5425 Creditview Road
Unit 8
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214
Address: 10260 Kennedy Rd North
Brampton Ontario L6T 3S1
Phone: (905) 495-4695
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2180 Speakman Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1
Phone: 9053692442
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4350 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7C8
Phone: (905) 812-1175
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1060 Eglinton Ave
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1K3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2180 Speakman Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1
Phone: 9053692442
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10443 Highway 27
Vaughan
Woodbridge Ontario L0J 1C0
Phone: (289) 202-2222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sequeira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sequeira (CPSO#: 64093 ) Dr. N. Sequeira (CPSO#: 122008 )
Business Address: 10260 Kennedy Road North
Brampton Ontario L6T 3S1
(905) 495-4695
Business Address: 1060 Eglinton Avenue Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1K3
(905) 624-1511
Business Address: Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P3
(905) 826-1164
Business Address: 7891 McLaughlin Road
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5H8
(905) 459-4904
Business Address: 4350 Mississauga Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7C8
(905) 812-1175
Business Address: 2250 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5B 1M8
9052700411
Business Address: 2180 Speakman Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERROL JOSEPH SEQUEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEQUEIRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERROL JOSEPH SEQUEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEQUEIRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991