THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rogers Communications Inc
Corporate Health Services
3rd Floor
333 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 935-6688
Fax: (416) 935-4211
Address: Rogers Communications Inc
Corporate Health Services
8200 Dixie Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 0C1
Phone: (647) 747-9355
Fax: (647) 747-9350

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Satok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Satok (CPSO#: 64105 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rogers Communications Inc
Corporate Health Services
3rd Floor
333 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 935-6688
Fax: (416) 935-4211
Address: Rogers Communications Inc
Corporate Health Services
8200 Dixie Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 0C1
Phone: (647) 747-9355
Fax: (647) 747-9350

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Satok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Satok (CPSO#: 64105 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW SATOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATOK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW SATOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATOK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991