THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:07:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-3420 Hurontario Street
clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-897-6160
Fax: 905-897-6729

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rawieh El-Sayegh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. El-Sayegh (CPSO#: 64116 )
Business Address: 3420 Hurontario Street
201
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A9
905-897-6160

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-3420 Hurontario Street
clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-897-6160
Fax: 905-897-6729

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rawieh El-Sayegh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. El-Sayegh (CPSO#: 64116 )
Business Address: 3420 Hurontario Street
201
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A9
905-897-6160

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAWIEH EL-SAYEGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SAYEGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAWIEH EL-SAYEGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SAYEGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991