THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:39:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 204
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hien Ta, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ta (CPSO#: 64123 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortelluci Vaughan Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Address: 6 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2N 6L1
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212 Extn: 2110
Business Address: 204-5460 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
(416) 250-7171

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 204
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hien Ta, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ta (CPSO#: 64123 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortelluci Vaughan Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Address: 6 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2N 6L1
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212 Extn: 2110
Business Address: 204-5460 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
(416) 250-7171

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIEN MINH TA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIEN MINH TA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991