THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:12:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ERITREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UNIT 106
245 Dixon Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9P 2M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 247-8781
Fax: (416) 247-8670

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berih (CPSO#: 64126 )
Business Address: 106 - 245 Dixon Road
Toronto Ontario M9P 2M4
(416) 247-8781

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ERITREAN
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UNIT 106
245 Dixon Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9P 2M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 247-8781
Fax: (416) 247-8670

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berih (CPSO#: 64126 )
Business Address: 106 - 245 Dixon Road
Toronto Ontario M9P 2M4
(416) 247-8781

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAHI ALISHEIKH BERIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERIH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAHI ALISHEIKH BERIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERIH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991