THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:39:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C F Health Services GP HQ
101 Colonel By Drive
Carling Campus, Building 9
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-410-2982
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1454 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Jetly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jetly (CPSO#: 64129 )
Business Address: 181 University Ave
Suite 1605
Toronto ON M5H 3M7
(613) 410-2983

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C F Health Services GP HQ
101 Colonel By Drive
Carling Campus, Building 9
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-410-2982
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1454 Dundas Street East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Jetly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jetly (CPSO#: 64129 )
Business Address: 181 University Ave
Suite 1605
Toronto ON M5H 3M7
(613) 410-2983

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAKESH JETLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETLY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAKESH JETLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETLY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991