THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:31:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
1915 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 233-3976
Fax: 6136951996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Messina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Messina (CPSO#: 64175 )
Business Address: 302-1915 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON K2C 0C7
(613) 233-3976

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
1915 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 233-3976
Fax: 6136951996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Messina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Messina (CPSO#: 64175 )
Business Address: 302-1915 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON K2C 0C7
(613) 233-3976

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARINA MESSINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESSINA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARINA MESSINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESSINA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1991