THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Dr.
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jul 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadine Manson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manson (CPSO#: 64181 )
Business Address: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
(905) 451-1937
Business Address: Suite 201A
10 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0G6
(289) 233-1957

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Dr.
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jul 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadine Manson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manson (CPSO#: 64181 )
Business Address: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
(905) 451-1937
Business Address: Suite 201A
10 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0G6
(289) 233-1957

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADINE ELIZABETH FLETCHER MANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADINE ELIZABETH FLETCHER MANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991