THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:49:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6489 Rockcliffe Estates
6489 Rockcliffe estates
Niagara Falls Ontario L2J 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057082148
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas C. H. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Li (CPSO#: 64196 )
Business Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 358-0171 Extn: 53422

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6489 Rockcliffe Estates
6489 Rockcliffe estates
Niagara Falls Ontario L2J 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057082148
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas C. H. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Li (CPSO#: 64196 )
Business Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 358-0171 Extn: 53422

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CHIT HANG LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS CHIT HANG LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991