THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:10:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PERSIAN, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 301
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-4440
Fax: (905) 683-3303

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sohail Khattak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khattak (CPSO#: 64200 )
Business Address: 301 - 300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
(905) 683-4440

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PERSIAN, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 301
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-4440
Fax: (905) 683-3303

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sohail Khattak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khattak (CPSO#: 64200 )
Business Address: 301 - 300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
(905) 683-4440

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD SOHAIL KHATTAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATTAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD SOHAIL KHATTAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATTAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1991