THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 05:56:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Office of the Chief Coroner
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 301-5111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 16 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLeod-Wells Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. McLeod (CPSO#: 65265 ) Dr. R. Wells (CPSO#: 64213 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Office of the Chief Coroner
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 301-5111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 16 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McLeod-Wells Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. McLeod (CPSO#: 65265 ) Dr. R. Wells (CPSO#: 64213 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ALEXANDER WELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ALEXANDER WELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991