THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:43:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
7 MC 409
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5207
Fax: (416) 603-5004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chen (CPSO#: 64219 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
7 M C 409
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5207

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
7 MC 409
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5207
Fax: (416) 603-5004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chen (CPSO#: 64219 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
7 M C 409
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5207

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT E WEI CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT E WEI CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991