THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:13:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Geriatric Assessment Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 16486
Fax: (613) 761-5334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Molnar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Molnar (CPSO#: 64242 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 795-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Geriatric Assessment Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 16486
Fax: (613) 761-5334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Molnar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Molnar (CPSO#: 64242 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 795-5555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK JOSEPH MOLNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLNAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK JOSEPH MOLNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLNAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991