THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:12:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-7077 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-709-1366
Fax: 905-771-6726

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jae Hoon Cho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cho (CPSO#: 64243 )
Business Address: 2 - 7077 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 2J6
(905) 709-1366

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-7077 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-709-1366
Fax: 905-771-6726

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jae Hoon Cho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cho (CPSO#: 64243 )
Business Address: 2 - 7077 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 2J6
(905) 709-1366

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAE-HOON CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAE-HOON CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 10 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 09 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 09 May 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1991