THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aligarh Muslim University, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Oakville Health Centre
1060 Speers Road
Suite 208
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 339-0008
Fax: (905) 842-8001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zeba Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ansari (CPSO#: 64261 )
Business Address: The Oakville Health Centre
Suite 208
1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Aligarh Muslim University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Oakville Health Centre
1060 Speers Road
Suite 208
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 339-0008
Fax: (905) 842-8001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zeba Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ansari (CPSO#: 64261 )
Business Address: The Oakville Health Centre
Suite 208
1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZEBA INTIKHAB ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZEBA INTIKHAB ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aligarh Muslim University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991