THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:02:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-704 Mara St
Suite106
Point Edward ON N7V 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 5426512
Fax: 519 5428831
Address: 106-704 Mara St
Point Edward ON N7V 1X4
Phone: 519 5426512
Fax: 519 5428831

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Dec 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Ilango Lena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lena (CPSO#: 64293 )
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-704 Mara St
Suite106
Point Edward ON N7V 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 5426512
Fax: 519 5428831
Address: 106-704 Mara St
Point Edward ON N7V 1X4
Phone: 519 5426512
Fax: 519 5428831

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Dec 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Ilango Lena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lena (CPSO#: 64293 )
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY ILANGO LENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY ILANGO LENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 1994
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1991