THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:06:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Kakulu Rd.
Kanata ON K2L 3C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-592-1448
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judy L. Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson (CPSO#: 64349 )
Business Address: 101-280 Herzberg Rd
Kanata ON K2K 0N8
613-599-0955

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Kakulu Rd.
Kanata ON K2L 3C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-592-1448
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judy L. Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson (CPSO#: 64349 )
Business Address: 101-280 Herzberg Rd
Kanata ON K2K 0N8
613-599-0955

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDY LOUISE PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDY LOUISE PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1991