THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:06:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 137 Gordon St
n/a
Cambridge ON N1S 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9029562657
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Colchester East Hants Health Centre
600 Abenaki Rd
Truro NS B2N 5A1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MILTON WYBENGA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wybenga (CPSO#: 64359 )
Business Address: 28 Aspen Ridge Crt
Cambridge ON N1S 4Z7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 137 Gordon St
n/a
Cambridge ON N1S 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9029562657
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Colchester East Hants Health Centre
600 Abenaki Rd
Truro NS B2N 5A1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MILTON WYBENGA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wybenga (CPSO#: 64359 )
Business Address: 28 Aspen Ridge Crt
Cambridge ON N1S 4Z7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILTON PETER WYBENGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYBENGA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILTON PETER WYBENGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYBENGA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 16 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1991