THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON L3R 1A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 943-7382
Fax: (905) 943-9105

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ajai K. Pasricha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pasricha (CPSO#: 64430 )
Business Address: 203-7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON L3R 1A3
(905) 943-7382

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON L3R 1A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 943-7382
Fax: (905) 943-9105

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ajai K. Pasricha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pasricha (CPSO#: 64430 )
Business Address: 203-7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON L3R 1A3
(905) 943-7382

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AJAI KUMAR PASRICHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASRICHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AJAI KUMAR PASRICHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASRICHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1991