THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:13:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Monash University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Extension: 8133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Scarborough Health Network
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary site
2867 Ellesmere rd.
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: 416 284 8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leah Harfa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harfa (CPSO#: 64452 )
Business Address: Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: Scarborough Hospital - Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Monash University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Extension: 8133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Scarborough Health Network
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary site
2867 Ellesmere rd.
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: 416 284 8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leah Harfa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harfa (CPSO#: 64452 )
Business Address: Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: Scarborough Hospital - Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEAH HARFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARFA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEAH HARFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARFA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Monash University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1991