THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:25:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 208
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 352-3674
Fax: (647) 352-3673

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 12 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Medical Oncology
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daryl Roitman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Roitman (CPSO#: 64488 )
Business Address: 208 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(647) 352-2674

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 208
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 352-3674
Fax: (647) 352-3673

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 12 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Medical Oncology
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daryl Roitman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Roitman (CPSO#: 64488 )
Business Address: 208 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(647) 352-2674

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARYL SCOTT ROITMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROITMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARYL SCOTT ROITMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROITMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1991