THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:54:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204-4800 Leslie St
North York Pediatrics
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-497-1987
Fax: 416-499-6301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. Govan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Govan (CPSO#: 64543 )
Business Address: 204-4800 Leslie St
North York Pediatrics
North York ON M2J 2K9
(416) 499-6161

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204-4800 Leslie St
North York Pediatrics
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-497-1987
Fax: 416-499-6301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. Govan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Govan (CPSO#: 64543 )
Business Address: 204-4800 Leslie St
North York Pediatrics
North York ON M2J 2K9
(416) 499-6161

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAIRAJ JIVAN GOVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOVAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAIRAJ JIVAN GOVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOVAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 1991