THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:26:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2435 Ninth Line
Oakville Ontario L6H 7G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 725-8910
Fax: (289) 725-8066

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 06 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Sapir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sapir (CPSO#: 64566 )
Business Address: 2435 Ninth Line
Oakville ON L6H 7G9

Corporation Name: Daniel Sapir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Leicester, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2435 Ninth Line
Oakville Ontario L6H 7G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 725-8910
Fax: (289) 725-8066

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 06 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Sapir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sapir (CPSO#: 64566 )
Business Address: 2435 Ninth Line
Oakville ON L6H 7G9

Corporation Name: Daniel Sapir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL SAPIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAPIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL SAPIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAPIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 1991