THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:27:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Health Care Centre
Room B3-628
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3488
Fax: (519) 646-6139
Address: 339 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3488
Fax: (519) 646-6139
Address: London Cardiac Institute
1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: (519) 645-1584

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suskin and Ettler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Suskin (CPSO#: 64624 ) Dr. H. Ettler (CPSO#: 66988 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C6-124G - 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Room B3-628
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 663-3488
Business Address: 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
Suite 201
London Ontario N6G 0W7
(519) 645-0146

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Health Care Centre
Room B3-628
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3488
Fax: (519) 646-6139
Address: 339 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3488
Fax: (519) 646-6139
Address: London Cardiac Institute
1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: (519) 645-1584

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suskin and Ettler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Suskin (CPSO#: 64624 ) Dr. H. Ettler (CPSO#: 66988 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C6-124G - 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Room B3-628
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 663-3488
Business Address: 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
Suite 201
London Ontario N6G 0W7
(519) 645-0146

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEVILLE GORDON SUSKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUSKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEVILLE GORDON SUSKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUSKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 1991