THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:32:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 45 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 900
Toronto Ontario M2N 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-821-6829
Fax: 647-342-1855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.R. Reznek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Reznek (CPSO#: 64661 )
Business Address: Suite 900
45 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2N 5W9
(647) 821-6829

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 45 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 900
Toronto Ontario M2N 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-821-6829
Fax: 647-342-1855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.R. Reznek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Reznek (CPSO#: 64661 )
Business Address: Suite 900
45 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2N 5W9
(647) 821-6829

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE RAPHAEL REZNEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REZNEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE RAPHAEL REZNEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REZNEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 1991