THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 15:29:23 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 2
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siemens Jaeger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jaeger (CPSO#: 64665 ) Dr. D. Siemens (CPSO#: 65432 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology - Empire 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2411
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology & Perioperative Medi
Victory 2 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 2
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siemens Jaeger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jaeger (CPSO#: 64665 ) Dr. D. Siemens (CPSO#: 65432 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology - Empire 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2411
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology & Perioperative Medi
Victory 2 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE TERAIS JAEGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAEGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE TERAIS JAEGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAEGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 1991