THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:33:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shanxi Medical College, Taiyun, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
LHSC University Hospital
B6-112
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3468
Fax: (519) 663-3477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 13 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Guo (CPSO#: 64709 )
Business Address: LHSC-Department of Surgery
339 Windermere Road
B6-112
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3468

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Shanxi Medical College, Taiyun, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
LHSC University Hospital
B6-112
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3468
Fax: (519) 663-3477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 13 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Guo (CPSO#: 64709 )
Business Address: LHSC-Department of Surgery
339 Windermere Road
B6-112
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3468

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Apr 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 13 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LIN-RUI GUO may practise medicine independently in Cardiac Surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LIN-RUI GUO may practise medicine independently in Cardiac Surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shanxi Medical College, Taiyun, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Apr 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Dec 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2004
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Jul 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Sep 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 May 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1991
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2000

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 May 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 1991