THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:44:58 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 878-1778
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 28 Aug 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MICHAEL VASSILYADI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vassilyadi (CPSO#: 64715 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GREEK
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 878-1778
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 28 Aug 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MICHAEL VASSILYADI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vassilyadi (CPSO#: 64715 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL VASSILYADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASSILYADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL VASSILYADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASSILYADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 1991