THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:24:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Arts Building
581 Davis Drive
Suite 602B
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046
Address: Thistlewood Medical Centre
Unit 310
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
Phone: (905) 265-2000
Fax: (905) 265-9687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Chun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chun (CPSO#: 64745 )
Business Address: Thistlewood Medical Centre
310 - 807 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Arts Building
581 Davis Drive
Suite 602B
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046
Address: Thistlewood Medical Centre
Unit 310
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
Phone: (905) 265-2000
Fax: (905) 265-9687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Chun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chun (CPSO#: 64745 )
Business Address: Thistlewood Medical Centre
310 - 807 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT CHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 1991