THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:39:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-8606
Fax: (416) 813-8266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 26 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ELISE HEON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Heon (CPSO#: 64784 )
Business Address: 4168138606

Corporation Name: Dr. Elise Heon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-8606
Fax: (416) 813-8266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 26 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ELISE HEON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Heon (CPSO#: 64784 )
Business Address: 4168138606

Corporation Name: Dr. Elise Heon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISE HEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISE HEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1994

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 1992