THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 17:09:46 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
3950 14th Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 305-1700
Fax: (905) 305-1706

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Lee & Dr. I. Haney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haney (CPSO#: 64790 ) Dr. K. Lee (CPSO#: 60952 )
Business Address: 105 - 3950 14th Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 0A9
(905) 305-1700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
3950 14th Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 305-1700
Fax: (905) 305-1706

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Lee & Dr. I. Haney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haney (CPSO#: 64790 ) Dr. K. Lee (CPSO#: 60952 )
Business Address: 105 - 3950 14th Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 0A9
(905) 305-1700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE MARTHE ISABEL HANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE MARTHE ISABEL HANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1994

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 1992