THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Zambia, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elgin Mills Professional Centre
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Suite 212
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-237-4814
Fax: 905-237-4815
Address: Mind Forward
176 Robert Speck Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3G1
Phone: (905) 949-4411
Fax: (905) 949-4019
Address: YSBIS
13311 Yonge Street
Oak Ridges Ontario L4E 3S8
Phone: (905) 773-3038
Fax: (905) 773-5176
Address: Brain Injury Community Re-Entry
3340 Schmon Parkway, Unit 2
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Phone: 905-687-6788
Fax: 905-641-2785
Address: CHIRS
62 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2N 7G1
Phone: (416) 240-8000
Fax: (416) 240-1149
Address: March of Dimes Canada
75 Cooperage Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 0J5
Phone: (416) 238-5868
Extension: 6401
Fax: (647) 689-2584

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Feb 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seyone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Seyone (CPSO#: 64818 )
Business Address: Elgin Mills Professional Centre
212-1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
(905) 237-4814
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
Room MP 7-427
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(647) 283-5128
Business Address: 176 Robert Speck Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3G1
(905) 949-4411
Business Address: 62 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2N 7G1
(416) 240-8000
Business Address: 13311 Yonge Street
Oak Ridges Ontario L4W 3S8
(905) 773-3038

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Zambia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elgin Mills Professional Centre
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Suite 212
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-237-4814
Fax: 905-237-4815
Address: Mind Forward
176 Robert Speck Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3G1
Phone: (905) 949-4411
Fax: (905) 949-4019
Address: YSBIS
13311 Yonge Street
Oak Ridges Ontario L4E 3S8
Phone: (905) 773-3038
Fax: (905) 773-5176
Address: Brain Injury Community Re-Entry
3340 Schmon Parkway, Unit 2
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Phone: 905-687-6788
Fax: 905-641-2785
Address: CHIRS
62 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2N 7G1
Phone: (416) 240-8000
Fax: (416) 240-1149
Address: March of Dimes Canada
75 Cooperage Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 0J5
Phone: (416) 238-5868
Extension: 6401
Fax: (647) 689-2584

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Feb 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seyone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Seyone (CPSO#: 64818 )
Business Address: Elgin Mills Professional Centre
212-1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
(905) 237-4814
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
Room MP 7-427
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(647) 283-5128
Business Address: 176 Robert Speck Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3G1
(905) 949-4411
Business Address: 62 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2N 7G1
(416) 240-8000
Business Address: 13311 Yonge Street
Oak Ridges Ontario L4W 3S8
(905) 773-3038

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTHIRASEKARAM SEYONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEYONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTHIRASEKARAM SEYONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEYONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Zambia, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 1992