THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:56:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137226521
Extension: 6875
Fax: 6136834404

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajiv Bhatla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhatla (CPSO#: 64869 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4

Corporation Name: Rajiv Bhatla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137226521
Extension: 6875
Fax: 6136834404

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajiv Bhatla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhatla (CPSO#: 64869 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4

Corporation Name: Rajiv Bhatla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJIV BHATLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJIV BHATLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 1992