THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:53:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guardian Medical Arts Building
1950 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 201
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 472-2852
Fax: (705) 472-0333
Address: The West Nipissing General Hospital
111 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P0H 2G0
Phone: (705) 753-3110
Fax: (705) 753-0210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 05 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prinja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Prinja (CPSO#: 64874 )
Business Address: 201 - 1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z2
(705) 472-2852

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guardian Medical Arts Building
1950 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 201
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 472-2852
Fax: (705) 472-0333
Address: The West Nipissing General Hospital
111 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P0H 2G0
Phone: (705) 753-3110
Fax: (705) 753-0210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 05 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prinja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Prinja (CPSO#: 64874 )
Business Address: 201 - 1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Z2
(705) 472-2852

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVIN PRINJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRINJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVIN PRINJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRINJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 1992