THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:11:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 406
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 256-9200
Fax: (416) 256-9201
Address: Osler Sleep Clinic
Suite 140
135 Queen's Plate Dr.
Etobicoke Ontario M9W6V1
Phone: 4162315770
Fax: 4162315229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Rosenberg + Hedy Steinberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosenberg (CPSO#: 64904 ) Dr. H. Steinberg (CPSO#: 59632 )
Business Address: 210 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
(416) 485-9044
Business Address: 140 - 135 Queen's Plate Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
(416) 231-5229
Business Address: 406 - 100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
(416) 256-9200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 406
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 256-9200
Fax: (416) 256-9201
Address: Osler Sleep Clinic
Suite 140
135 Queen's Plate Dr.
Etobicoke Ontario M9W6V1
Phone: 4162315770
Fax: 4162315229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Rosenberg + Hedy Steinberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosenberg (CPSO#: 64904 ) Dr. H. Steinberg (CPSO#: 59632 )
Business Address: 210 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
(416) 485-9044
Business Address: 140 - 135 Queen's Plate Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
(416) 231-5229
Business Address: 406 - 100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
(416) 256-9200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH IRA ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH IRA ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 1992

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 1992