THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 457-3458
Fax: (905) 595-1115

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 02 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.L. May Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. May (CPSO#: 64922 )
Business Address: 164 Queen St E
Suite 307
Brampton ON L6V 1B4
9054573458
Business Address: Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B4
(905) 457-3458

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 457-3458
Fax: (905) 595-1115

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 02 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.L. May Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. May (CPSO#: 64922 )
Business Address: 164 Queen St E
Suite 307
Brampton ON L6V 1B4
9054573458
Business Address: Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1B4
(905) 457-3458

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA LYN MAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA LYN MAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 1992