THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:28:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-111 Granton Dr
Richmond Hill ON L4B 1L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 877-718-2196
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3-511 Ray Lawson Blvd
Brampton ON L6Y 0N2
Phone: 905-459-2422
Fax: 1-807-230-0130
Address: 100 Pertosa Drive Suite 205
Brampton
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Phone: 289 966 2940
Fax: 647 436 7814
Address: 75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
Phone: 226-783-4649
Fax: 647-689-3744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maur (CPSO#: 64924 )
Business Address: 100 Pertosa Drive
Suite 205
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
(647) 539-0443

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-111 Granton Dr
Richmond Hill ON L4B 1L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 877-718-2196
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3-511 Ray Lawson Blvd
Brampton ON L6Y 0N2
Phone: 905-459-2422
Fax: 1-807-230-0130
Address: 100 Pertosa Drive Suite 205
Brampton
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Phone: 289 966 2940
Fax: 647 436 7814
Address: 75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
Phone: 226-783-4649
Fax: 647-689-3744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maur (CPSO#: 64924 )
Business Address: 100 Pertosa Drive
Suite 205
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
(647) 539-0443

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH MAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH MAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 26 Oct 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 1992