THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:32:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 45 Kensington Pl
Chatham ON N7M 2X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DePass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Depass (CPSO#: 64925 )
Business Address: 45 Kensington Pl
Chatham ON N7M 2X7
5194013623
Business Address: 65 Thames Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 1S4
(519) 354-1200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 45 Kensington Pl
Chatham ON N7M 2X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DePass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Depass (CPSO#: 64925 )
Business Address: 45 Kensington Pl
Chatham ON N7M 2X7
5194013623
Business Address: 65 Thames Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 1S4
(519) 354-1200

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
30 Mar 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 30 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon


As from 11:59 p.m., March 30, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
and limitations are imposed on the certificate registration held by Dr. Ian
Egbert Depass:

a) Dr. Depass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant
in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical
assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the
College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means
that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot by
the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from
providing pre-operative and post-operative care or any office
practice.

b) That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all
professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (a).

c) That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in
effect, Dr. Depass shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of
his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the
purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon


As from 11:59 p.m., March 30, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
and limitations are imposed on the certificate registration held by Dr. Ian
Egbert Depass:

a) Dr. Depass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant
in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical
assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the
College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means
that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot by
the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from
providing pre-operative and post-operative care or any office
practice.

b) That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all
professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (a).

c) That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in
effect, Dr. Depass shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of
his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the
purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (2)

Date of Decision: 10 Jul 2012
Summary of Decision:
On July 10, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ian Egbert DePass committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. DePass admitted to the professional misconduct. Since early August 2008, Dr. DePass has been practising only as a surgical assistant.

The Discipline Committee found that Dr. DePass failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of five patients. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. the Registrar maintain the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. DePass' certificate of registration:

(i) Dr. DePass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from providing preoperative and postoperative care or any office practice.

(ii) That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (i).

(iii) That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in effect, Dr. DePass shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.

2. Dr. DePass appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. DePass pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within ninety (90) days from the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 10, 2012

Date of Decision: 08 Oct 2009
Summary of Decision:
On October 8, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Depass, a general surgeon, committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Depass is incompetent, that is, his care of three patients displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment and disregard for patient welfare of such a nature and to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue to practise or that his practice should be restricted.

The Committee found that Dr. Depass failed to meet the standard of practice and is incompetent with respect to his management of the abdominal surgery of three patients including aspects of pre-operative, intra-operative and post-operative care such as:

Regarding Patient A, failing to take sufficient steps to confirm the working diagnosis in advance of the operation and in the post-operative management of the patient.

Regarding Patient B, in failing to conduct a radiologic procedure during surgery and failing to undertake sufficient investigations during the post-operative period before discharging the patient.

Regarding Patient E, in failing to refer the patient to a surgeon with the requisite skill to manage a difficult and locally-advanced tumor.

On March 30, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. DePass attend before the panel to be reprimanded on a date not later than three months from the date that the order becomes final.

2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. DePass' certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:

a) Dr. DePass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from providing pre-operative and post-operative care or any office practice.

b) That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (a).

c) That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in effect, Dr. DePass shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 22-24 and June 26 continuing July 7-9, 2009

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (2)

Date of Decision: 10 Jul 2012
Summary of Decision:
On July 10, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ian Egbert DePass committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. DePass admitted to the professional misconduct. Since early August 2008, Dr. DePass has been practising only as a surgical assistant.

The Discipline Committee found that Dr. DePass failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of five patients. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. the Registrar maintain the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. DePass' certificate of registration:

(i) Dr. DePass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from providing preoperative and postoperative care or any office practice.

(ii) That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (i).

(iii) That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in effect, Dr. DePass shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.

2. Dr. DePass appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. DePass pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within ninety (90) days from the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 10, 2012

Date of Decision: 08 Oct 2009
Summary of Decision:
On October 8, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Depass, a general surgeon, committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Depass is incompetent, that is, his care of three patients displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment and disregard for patient welfare of such a nature and to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue to practise or that his practice should be restricted.

The Committee found that Dr. Depass failed to meet the standard of practice and is incompetent with respect to his management of the abdominal surgery of three patients including aspects of pre-operative, intra-operative and post-operative care such as:

Regarding Patient A, failing to take sufficient steps to confirm the working diagnosis in advance of the operation and in the post-operative management of the patient.

Regarding Patient B, in failing to conduct a radiologic procedure during surgery and failing to undertake sufficient investigations during the post-operative period before discharging the patient.

Regarding Patient E, in failing to refer the patient to a surgeon with the requisite skill to manage a difficult and locally-advanced tumor.

On March 30, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. DePass attend before the panel to be reprimanded on a date not later than three months from the date that the order becomes final.

2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. DePass' certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:

a) Dr. DePass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from providing pre-operative and post-operative care or any office practice.

b) That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (a).

c) That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in effect, Dr. DePass shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 22-24 and June 26 continuing July 7-9, 2009

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 30 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1992
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 1992