THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:57:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 895-4521
Extension: 2972
Fax: 905 853-2299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.D. Lingley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lingley (CPSO#: 64935 )
Business Address: Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 895-4521
Extension: 2972
Fax: 905 853-2299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.D. Lingley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lingley (CPSO#: 64935 )
Business Address: Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID LINGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID LINGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 29 Nov 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 1992