THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:57:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Trillium Health Partners
Department of General Surgery
M-site, Q-site and CVH
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-467-7711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Widman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Widman (CPSO#: 64946 )
Business Address: 517 - 115 George Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 0A2
(905) 467-7711
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit valley hospital
Department of General surgery
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
9058132200

Corporation Name: D.Widman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: DS Widman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Dec 2019

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2017

Corporation Name: Widman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2014

Corporation Name: David Widman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Dec 2011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Trillium Health Partners
Department of General Surgery
M-site, Q-site and CVH
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-467-7711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Widman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Widman (CPSO#: 64946 )
Business Address: 517 - 115 George Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 0A2
(905) 467-7711
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit valley hospital
Department of General surgery
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
9058132200

Corporation Name: D.Widman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: DS Widman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Dec 2019

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2017

Corporation Name: Widman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2014

Corporation Name: David Widman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Dec 2011

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
07 Oct 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 07 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from October 7, 2021, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Stephen Widman in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Widman to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Widman has voluntarily restricted his practice to administering vaccinations and to surgical assist under the direction of a qualified surgeon. For further clarity, Dr. Widman may not be the Most Responsible Physician for any patient whatsoever.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from October 7, 2021, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Stephen Widman in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Widman to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Widman has voluntarily restricted his practice to administering vaccinations and to surgical assist under the direction of a qualified surgeon. For further clarity, Dr. Widman may not be the Most Responsible Physician for any patient whatsoever.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 07 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 21 May 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992