THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:53:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 4615
Fax: 7052563494

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rogers (CPSO#: 64957 )
Business Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434 Extn: 4615
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road, Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B0A8
Business Address: 84 Norden Cres
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1T1
705-943-4202

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 4615
Fax: 7052563494

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rogers (CPSO#: 64957 )
Business Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434 Extn: 4615
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road, Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B0A8
Business Address: 84 Norden Cres
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1T1
705-943-4202

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA EWA ROGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA EWA ROGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992