THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:20:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital Site - I C U
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7663
Fax: (905) 804-7744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anant N. Murthy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Murthy (CPSO#: 65005 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre ICU
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(416) 294-4438
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital site
ICU
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
4162944438

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital Site - I C U
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7663
Fax: (905) 804-7744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anant N. Murthy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Murthy (CPSO#: 65005 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre ICU
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(416) 294-4438
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital site
ICU
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
4162944438

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANANT NARASIMHA MURTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANANT NARASIMHA MURTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992